Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Joseph O’Donnell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1931Born
6 Apr 195725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
6 Dec 198352.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
6 Dec 198352.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Britonia
10 Feb 198452.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Britonia
8 Nov 199463.3AppointedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
16 Dec 199463.4InstalledBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
8 Nov 200271.3ResignedBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
1 Feb 200977.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph O’Donnell
Bishop Edward Joseph O’Donnell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast