Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Joseph Donnelly

Deceased

Bishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1889Born
12 Jun 192132.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
19 Mar 194050.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
19 Mar 194050.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Coela
23 Apr 194051.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coela
9 Nov 194657.5AppointedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
13 Dec 195061.6DiedBishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for George Joseph Donnelly
Bishop George Joseph Donnelly (born , died ) Bishop of Kansas City in Kansas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaplewood, MO

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018