Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Timothy Michael Cardinal Dolan

Archbishop of New York, New York

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe a Monte Mario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1950 BornSt. Louis, MO
19 Jun 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
199443.9AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
19 Jun 200151.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
19 Jun 200151.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Natchesium
15 Aug 200151.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Natchesium
25 Jun 200252.4AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
28 Aug 200252.6InstalledArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
28 Sep 200757.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
9 Jul 200858.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
23 Feb 200959.0AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
15 Apr 200959.2InstalledArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
18 Feb 201262.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201262.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe a Monte Mario
14 Oct 201262.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe a Monte Mario

MicroData Summary for Timothy Michael Dolan:
Timothy Michael Cardinal Dolan (born ) Archbishop of New York

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of New York.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2009
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1n10: CB, 16 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,020
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 13 Feb 2014