Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Augustine Feehan

Deceased

Archbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1829Born
1 Nov 185223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
7 Jul 186535.8AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
1 Nov 186536.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
10 Sep 188051.0AppointedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
12 Jul 190272.8DiedArchbishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Augustine Feehan (VIAF: 31098729)
Archbishop Patrick Augustine Feehan (born , died ) Archbishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillenaule, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Death PlaceArchiepiscopal Residence, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 201, and Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017