Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Hogan

Deceased

Bishop of Kansas City, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1829BornBruff, Ireland
10 Apr 185222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
3 Mar 186838.8AppointedBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
13 Sep 186839.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
10 Sep 188051.3AppointedBishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
10 Sep 188051.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
19 Jun 189364.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
21 Feb 191383.8DiedBishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Hogan:
Bishop John Joseph Hogan (born , died ) Bishop of Kansas City

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 323, and Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013