Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Richard Kenrick

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1806BornDublin, Ireland
6 Mar 183225.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 184134.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
30 Apr 184134.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Draso
30 Nov 184135.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Draso
25 Sep 184337.1SucceededBishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
20 Jul 184740.9AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
21 May 189588.8RetiredArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
8 Jun 189588.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
4 Mar 189689.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Richard Kenrick:
Archbishop Peter Richard Kenrick (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Louis

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 54.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 366
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 179, and Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013