Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Matthew Rice

Bishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1960 BornSt. Louis
3 May 198625.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
3 Jan 198726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
1 Dec 201050.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
1 Dec 201050.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
13 Jan 201150.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufes
26 Apr 201655.7AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
1 Jun 201655.8InstalledBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Matthew Rice
Bishop Edward Matthew Rice (born ) Bishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield-Cape Girardeau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2011, Number 3
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Apr 2016