Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Elmer Cardinal Ritter

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1892Born
30 May 191724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
3 Feb 193340.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
3 Feb 193340.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
28 Mar 193340.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
24 Mar 193441.6AppointedBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
11 Nov 194452.3AppointedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
20 Jul 194654.0AppointedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 Jan 196168.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jan 196168.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana
10 Jun 196774.8DiedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Elmer Ritter
Joseph Elmer Cardinal Ritter (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Albany, IN

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,933, Number 16
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 290, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast