Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christian Herman Winkelmann

Deceased

Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1883Born
11 Jun 190723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
13 Sep 193350.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
13 Sep 193350.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sita
30 Nov 193350.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sita
27 Dec 193956.2AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
18 Nov 194663.1DiedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Christian Herman Winkelmann
Bishop Christian Herman Winkelmann (born , died ) Bishop of Wichita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018