Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert William Finn

Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1953 BornSaint Louis
7 Jul 197926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Mar 200450.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
3 May 200451.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
24 May 200552.1SucceededBishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert William Finn:
Bishop Robert William Finn (born ) Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kansas City-Saint Joseph.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 349
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2004
  • s: Bollettino, 24 May 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013