Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marion Francis Forst

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas

Titular Bishop of Leavenworth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1910BornSaint Louis
10 Jun 193423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
2 Jan 196049.3AppointedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
24 Mar 196049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
5 Apr 196049.5InstalledBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
16 Oct 197666.1ResignedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
16 Oct 197666.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
16 Oct 197666.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Scala
23 Dec 198676.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
23 Dec 198676.3RetiredTitular Bishop of Scala
23 Sep 199585.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leavenworth
2 Jun 200796.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Marion Francis Forst:
Bishop Marion Francis Forst (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kansas City in Kansas

  • a priest for 72.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 20
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015