Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Hennessy

Deceased

Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1847Born
28 Nov 186922.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 188841.1AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
30 Nov 188841.3Ordained BishopBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
1891²43.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Concordia, Kansas, USA
May 1898²50.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Concordia, Kansas, USA
13 Jul 192072.9DiedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Hennessy
Bishop John Joseph Hennessy (born , died ) Bishop of Wichita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCloyne, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. John, Church, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 598
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017