Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Frank Stika

Bishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1957 Born
1 May 198527.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
14 Dec 198528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
12 Jan 200951.5AppointedBishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA
19 Mar 200951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Frank Stika
Bishop Richard Frank Stika (born ) Bishop of Knoxville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, MO, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained BishopConvention Center, Knoxville, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Knoxville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast