Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of New Orleans

Archidioecesis Novae Aureliae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gregory Michael Aymond, Archbishop
  • Alfred Clifton Hughes, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Francis Bible Schulte, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Dominic Carmon, S.V.D., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 July 1850
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Louisiana
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 10,895 (4,208 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: V (AL, KY, LA, MS, TN)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: NO
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arch-no.org/
  • Mailing Address: 7887 Walmsley Ave., New Orleans, LA 70125-3496
  • Telephone: (504)861-9521
  • Fax: 866-2906

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans)
25 April 1793ErectedDiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana Diocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) (erected)
29 August 1825Territory LostDiocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) Vicariate Apostolic of Alabama and the Floridas (erected)
18 July 1826Territory LostDiocese of Durango
Diocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans)
Diocese of Saint Louis (erected)
18 July 1826Territory LostDiocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) Vicariate Apostolic of Mississippi (erected)
Diocese of New Orleans
18 July 1826Name ChangedDiocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans) Diocese of New Orleans
19 July 1850Territory LostDiocese of New Orleans Vicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains (erected)
Archdiocese of New Orleans
19 July 1850ElevatedDiocese of New Orleans Archdiocese of New Orleans
29 July 1853Territory LostArchdiocese of New Orleans Diocese of Natchitoches (erected)
11 January 1918Territory LostArchdiocese of New Orleans Diocese of Lafayette (erected)
22 July 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of New Orleans Diocese of Baton Rouge (erected)
2 March 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of New Orleans Diocese of Houma-Thibodaux (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of New Orleans
1949456,1001,039,57643.9%1862714579983671,658159ap1951
1966603,0001,281,70047.0%2073465531,0905212,057154ap1967
1970636,2421,380,40046.1%2303525821,0936021,706153ap1971
1976663,0121,370,98048.4%2753446191,071195751,217165ap1977
1980529,7061,263,20041.9%241290531997405391,258134ap1981
1990542,8491,380,20039.3%2372945311,0221505151,084146ap1991
1999482,3731,332,77136.2%2292024311,119186129831146ap2000
2000468,7981,333,28535.2%2201914111,140196341866146ap2001
2001489,6521,331,56136.8%2201864061,206193333824146ap2002
2002488,0041,360,43635.9%2181793971,229211320800142ap2003
2003488,5841,355,54236.0%2181884061,203203316765142ap2004
2004488,0041,359,13635.9%1951952,502190331739142ap2005*
2009387,1011,075,28336.0%1951633581,081192237458108ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013