Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Glennon Patrick Flavin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1916Born
20 Dec 194125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
17 Apr 195741.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
17 Apr 195741.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioannina
30 May 195741.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioannina
29 May 196751.2AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
24 Mar 199276.0RetiredBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
27 Aug 199579.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Glennon Patrick Flavin
Bishop Glennon Patrick Flavin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lincoln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Louis, MO

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast