Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Kenny Carroll

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wichita, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1896Born
10 Jun 192225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
15 Feb 194750.2AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
23 Apr 194750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
27 Sep 196770.8ResignedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
27 Sep 196770.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Taparura
16 Jan 197679.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Taparura
12 Jan 198588.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Wichita, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Mark Kenny Carroll
Bishop Mark Kenny Carroll (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wichita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast