Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Joseph Kain

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1841Born
2 Jul 186625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
12 Feb 187533.6AppointedBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
23 May 187533.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
16 Jun 189352.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 Jun 189352.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
8 Jun 189554.0SucceededArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
13 Oct 190362.3DiedArchbishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Kain (VIAF: 36655216)
Archbishop John Joseph Kain (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartinsburg, VA, Diocese of Richmond, Virginia
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Wheeling, Diocese of Wheeling, West Virginia

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 352, and Page 432
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 598
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017