Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Birmingham

Archidioecesis Birminghamiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernard Longley, Archbishop
  • Robert Byrne, C.O., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Leonard William Kenney, C.P., Auxiliary Bishop
  • David Christopher McGough, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Philip Pargeter, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 October 1911
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: England
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 9,936 (3,837 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprising: Counties of Warwickshire, Oxfordshire, Staffordshire, West Midlands and Worcestershire.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.birminghamdiocese.org.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Cathedral House, St. Chad's Queensway, Birmingham, B4 6EX, England, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (0121)230.6237
  • Fax: 236-2699

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District
30 January 1688ErectedVicariate Apostolic of England Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District (erected)
1840Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Midland District Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern District (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Central District
1840Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Midland District Vicariate Apostolic of Central District
29 September 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central District Diocese of Nottingham (erected)
29 September 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central District
Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District
Vicariate Apostolic of Wales District
Diocese of Shrewsbury (erected)
Diocese of Birmingham
29 September 1850ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Central District Diocese of Birmingham
Archdiocese of Birmingham
28 October 1911ElevatedDiocese of Birmingham Archdiocese of Birmingham

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Birmingham
1950239,9473,595,7126.7%3302615914063081,150220ap1951
1959262,6694,280,7256.1%3912136044343201,150207ap1960
1970328,9184,959,3406.6%3902466365173221,395228ap1971
1980361,4835,078,2207.1%3331815147032061,139231ap1981
1990318,6585,173,0006.2%30114844970972231,200232ap1991
1999291,8005,323,3905.5%31714746462845301762228ap2000
2000296,1265,353,3905.5%30014944965950303759227ap2001
2001287,6585,235,6585.5%26515141669158305540225ap2002
2002285,9565,235,3815.5%28115143266161231520225ap2003
2003288,1975,236,4125.5%27315042368168240525225ap2004
2004286,5005,245,0005.5%27315242567472240521218ap2005
2006287,6605,267,3085.5%2602601,10680101521213ap2007*
2012286,7005,455,0005.3%24810635480981179521224ap2013
2013438,6754,945,6008.9%273873601,21884172235222ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Sep 2014