Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Patrick Dwyer

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1908Born
1 Nov 193224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
3 Aug 195748.8AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
24 Sep 195748.9Ordained BishopBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
5 Oct 196557.0AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
1 Sep 198172.9RetiredArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
17 Sep 198778.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Patrick Dwyer (VIAF: 93087714)
Archbishop George Patrick Dwyer (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth Place82 Monsall Street, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, Seminary, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Death PlaceSt. Paul, Convent, Selly Park, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 85
  • c4: CB, 10 Nov 2014
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast