Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonard William Kenney, C.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Midica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1946 Born
29 Jun 196923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
13 May 198741.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Stockholm, Sweden
13 May 198741.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Midica
24 Aug 198741.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Midica
17 Oct 200660.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Leonard William Kenney
Bishop Leonard William Kenney C.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewcastle upon Tyne

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,512
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jun 2017