Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Wareing

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Rhithymna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1791Born
15 Apr 181322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Midland District, England, Great Britain
28 Sep 181524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 184049.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, England, Great Britain
5 Jun 184049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
21 Sep 184049.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Areopolis
29 Sep 185059.6AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
24 Jan 185866.9ResignedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 185867.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
26 Dec 186574.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Wareing
Bishop William Wareing (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLincoln's Inn Fields, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestWolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained BishopOscott, College, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Central District, England
Death PlaceOld Hall, Convent, East Bergholt, Colchester, Suffolk, Diocese of Northampton, England
Buried Place (Original)Old Hall, Convent, East Bergholt, Colchester, Suffolk, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 417, and Page 481
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 87
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 211
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 31
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018