Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alan Stephen Hopes

Bishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1944 Born
1992²47.7Converted
4 Dec 199551.7Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
4 Jan 200358.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
4 Jan 200358.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
24 Jan 200358.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuncacestre
11 Jun 201369.2AppointedBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain
16 Jul 201369.3InstalledBishop of East Anglia, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alan Stephen Hopes
Bishop Alan Stephen Hopes (born ) Bishop of East Anglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOxford

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of East Anglia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,321
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017