Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph William Hendren, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1791BornBirmingham
19 Nov 180716.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Sep 181523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Jul 184856.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
28 Jul 184856.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
10 Sep 184856.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
29 Sep 185058.9AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185058.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185159.7AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
2 Dec 185160.1InstalledBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
1 Feb 185361.3ResignedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
25 Feb 185361.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
14 Nov 186675.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph William Hendren:
Bishop Joseph William Hendren O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,540
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 210, and Page 371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 418, and Page 460
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 587
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014