Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Brown

Deceased

Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1812Born
18 Feb 183725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185139.4AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
27 Jul 185139.5Ordained BishopBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
14 Oct 188169.7DiedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Brown
Bishop James Brown (born , died ) Bishop of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceGrange Bank Farm, Shrewsburgy, Shropshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)St. David, Priory, Pantasaph, Holywell, Flintshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 493
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 37
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 5 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Oct 2018

Quantcast