Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Humphrey Penderell Bright

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England

Titular Bishop of Soli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1903BornBrentwood, Essex
2 Jun 192825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
31 Aug 194441.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
31 Aug 194441.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Soli
28 Oct 194441.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Soli
26 Mar 196461.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Humphrey Penderell Bright
Bishop Humphrey Penderell Bright (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 50
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 43
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 3 May 2016