Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Stapleton

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1748Born
Apr 1771³22.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
1772²23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
7 Nov 180051.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
7 Nov 180051.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
8 Mar 180152.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
23 May 180253.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregory Stapleton
Bishop Gregory Stapleton (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Midland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlton Hall, Goole, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceL'auberge de Ste. Catherine, Saint-Omer, Diocese of Arras, France
Buried Place (Original)St Martin-au-Laërt, Cemetery, Saint-Omer, Diocese of Arras, France

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 214
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 188
  • od: CB, 20 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast