Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Longley

Archbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1955 Born
12 Dec 198126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
4 Jan 200347.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
4 Jan 200347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zarna
24 Jan 200347.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zarna
1 Oct 200954.4AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 200954.6InstalledArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Longley
Archbishop Bernard Longley (born ) Archbishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, College, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,320
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast