Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Edward Joseph Grimshaw

Deceased

Archbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1901Born
27 Feb 192624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clifton, England, Great Britain
2 Jun 194745.6AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 194745.8Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
11 May 195452.5AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 196563.4DiedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis Edward Joseph Grimshaw (VIAF: 89036669)
Archbishop Francis Edward Joseph Grimshaw (born , died ) Archbishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCranleigh Gardens, Bridgwater, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSts. Mary and Boniface, Cathedral, Plymouth, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, 6 Norfolk Road, Edgbaston, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 75
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 112
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018