Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Bernardine Collingridge, O.F.M. Rec. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1757Born
26 Jun 177316.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
1784²26.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
13 Jan 180749.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
13 Jan 180749.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
11 Oct 180750.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
17 Oct 180952.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
3 Mar 182971.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Bernardine Collingridge (VIAF: 315536421)
Bishop Peter Bernardine Collingridge O.F.M. Rec. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFritwell, Bicester, Oxfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Bonaventure's Friary, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceCannington, Bridgwater, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Original)Cannington, Bridgwater, Somerset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Gregory, Abbey, Downside, Radstock, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 366
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,141
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 69
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1807, Number 12
  • op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast