Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Walsh

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Cambysopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1776Born
19 Sep 180124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 182548.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 182548.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
1 May 182548.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cambysopolis
19 Apr 182649.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 184063.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central District, England, Great Britain
17 Jul 184871.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
18 Feb 184972.3DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Walsh (VIAF: 61047756)
Bishop Thomas Walsh (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestLongbirch, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained BishopLongbirch, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Death PlaceGolden Square, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Chad's, Birmingham, Vicariate Apostolic of Central District, England

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 129
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 207
  • opd/c1: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 15
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • burO: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast