Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Hugh Clifford

Deceased

Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1823Born
26 Jul 184925.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Western District, England, Great Britain
25 Aug 185026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Western District, England, Great Britain
6 Feb 185733.1AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
15 Feb 185733.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
14 Aug 189369.6DiedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Hugh Clifford (VIAF: 74110430)
Bishop William Joseph Hugh Clifford (born , died ) Bishop of Clifton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrnham, Grantham, Lincolnshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestTwelve Apostles, Pro-Cathedral, Clifton, Bristol, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePrior Park, Bath, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Original)College Chapel, Prior Park, Bath, Somerset, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 67
  • c4: CB, 10 Nov 2014
  • od: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 9
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 Jun 2018

Quantcast