Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph McCormack

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1887Born
11 Aug 191225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
30 Dec 193649.6AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 193749.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
2 Mar 195870.7DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph McCormack
Bishop Joseph McCormack (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBroadway, Worcestershire

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 7
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 141
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018