Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice Nol Lon Couve de Murville

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1929BornSaint-Germain-en-Laye, France
29 Jun 195728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
22 Jan 198252.6AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 198252.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
12 Jun 199970.0ResignedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
3 Nov 200778.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Maurice Nol Lon Couve de Murville:
Archbishop Maurice Nol Lon Couve de Murville (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 18 Sep 2014