Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David John Cashman

Deceased

Bishop of Arundel and Brighton, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1912BornBristol
24 Dec 193826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 195845.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 195845.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cantanus
27 May 195845.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cantanus
14 Jun 196552.5AppointedBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
21 Aug 196552.7InstalledBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
14 Mar 197158.2DiedBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for David John Cashman:
Bishop David John Cashman (born , died ) Bishop of Arundel and Brighton

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 10 Nov 2014