Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henry Weedall

Deceased

Priest of Midland District, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1788BornLondon
6 Apr 181425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 184051.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 184051.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
9 Sep 184052.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
9 Sep 184052.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Abydus
7 Nov 185971.1DiedPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Henry Weedall (VIAF: 784110)
Father Henry Weedall (born , died ) Priest of Midland District

  • a priest for 45.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016