Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Dey

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Britain, Military

Titular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1869Born
17 Feb 189424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
13 Apr 193565.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Britain, Military
13 Apr 193565.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
2 Jun 193565.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
8 May 194676.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Britain, Military

MicroData Summary for James Dey
Bishop James Dey (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Britain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWalsall, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceBarton on Sea, New Milton, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 40
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 78
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast