Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Masterson

Deceased

Archbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1899Born
27 Jul 192425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 194748.0AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
19 Mar 194748.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
30 Nov 195354.8DiedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Masterson
Archbishop Joseph Masterson (born , died ) Archbishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, 6 Norfolk Road, Edgbaston, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 15
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 150
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast