Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Yorke Bramston

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Usula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1763Born
1799¹35.7Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 182359.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 182359.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Usula
29 Jun 182360.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usula
26 Nov 182764.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
11 Jul 183673.3DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Yorke Bramston (VIAF: 51408277)
Bishop James Yorke Bramston (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOundle, Northamptonshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceSouthampton, Hampshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary Moorfields, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 385
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 40
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 23
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018