Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph McKinney

Bishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1954 Born
29 Jul 197824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
14 May 201561.0AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 201561.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph McKinney
Bishop Patrick Joseph McKinney (born ) Bishop of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalsall Heath, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Church, Buncrana, County Donegal, Diocese of Derry, Ireland
Ordained BishopSaint Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nottingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2015
  • mn: CL, 15 May 2015
  • c1: CL, [524] 2015
  • bp: CB, 3 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,538
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast