Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcus Nigel Stock

Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1961 Born
13 Aug 198826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
15 Sep 201453.0AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
13 Nov 201453.2Ordained BishopBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Marcus Nigel Stock (VIAF: 309834018)
Bishop Marcus Nigel Stock (born ) Bishop of Leeds

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Middlesex, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and St. Anne, Church, Caversham, Reading, Berkshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Leeds.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 Sep 2014
  • c2+: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,320
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast