Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Ilsley

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Macra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1838Born
29 Jun 186123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 187941.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 187941.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
4 Dec 187941.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
15 Feb 188849.7AppointedBishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 188849.8InstalledBishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 191173.4AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 192182.6RetiredArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 192183.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Macra
1 Dec 192688.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edward Ilsley (VIAF: 53653381)
Archbishop Edward Ilsley (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAppleyard Court, Stafford, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 149, and Page 270
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 63
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast