Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund James Knight

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Flavias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1827Born
19 Dec 185730.3Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
6 May 187951.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
6 May 187951.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Corycus
27 Jul 187951.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corycus
25 Apr 188254.6AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
11 May 189567.7ResignedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
28 May 189567.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
9 Jun 190577.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edmund James Knight
Bishop Edmund James Knight (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSheffield, South Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestCollegio Pio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopOur Lady, Church, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Death Place25 Kensington Court, Kensington, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Flaybrick, Cemetery, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 228, and Page 272
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 493
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 136
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 41
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 30 Mar 2018