Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin John Dunn

Deceased

Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1950Born
17 Jan 197625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
26 Mar 200453.7AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
25 May 200453.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
1 Mar 200857.6DiedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Kevin John Dunn (VIAF: 89206497)
Bishop Kevin John Dunn (born , died ) Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClayton, Newcastle (under-Lyme), Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and St. Werburgh, Church, Clayton, Newcastle (under-Lyme), Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Death PlaceFreeman, Hospital, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle upon Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,599
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • loc: CL, 1 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast