Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gray

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1919Born
20 Jun 194323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 196849.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
19 Dec 196849.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mercia
16 Feb 196949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mercia
19 Aug 198060.8AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 199575.6RetiredBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
7 May 199979.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gray (VIAF: 31527881)
Bishop Joseph Gray (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFinternagh, County Cavan, Diocese of Kilmore, Ireland
Ordained PriestSts. Patrick and Felim, Cathedral, Cavan City, County Cavan, Diocese of Kilmore, Ireland
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Liverpool, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, 99 Eleanor Road, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Winefride, Cemetery, Neston, Wirral, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 108
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast