Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis George Mostyn

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Abydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1800²Born
1 Mar 182828.1Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 184040.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 184040.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
21 Dec 184040.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
11 Aug 184747.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis George Mostyn
Bishop Francis George Mostyn (born 1800, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKidlington, Oxfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained PriestOscott, College, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Ordained BishopUshaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Death PlaceUshaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)Ushaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 19.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,284
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 56
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 155
  • opd: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 42
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018