Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Dicconson

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Mallus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1670Born
Jun 1701³30.5Ordained PriestPriest of Midland District, England, Great Britain
6 Oct 174069.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
6 Oct 174069.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
19 Mar 174170.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
5 May 175281.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Dicconson (VIAF: 78289920)
Bishop Edward Dicconson (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWrightington Hall, Wigan, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopGhent, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Death PlaceFinch Mill, Appley Bridge, Wigan, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Wilfrid's, Church, Standish, Wigan, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Arundel to Zabi, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274, and Page 454
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast