Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terence John Brain

Bishop Emeritus of Salford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1938 Born
22 Feb 196425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
5 Feb 199152.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
5 Feb 199152.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
25 Apr 199152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
2 Sep 199758.7AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
7 Oct 199758.8InstalledBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
30 Sep 201475.7RetiredBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Terence John Brain
Bishop Terence John Brain (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Salford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoventry, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salford.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,402
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,446
  • bd/c1/i: Website of the Diocese, 19 Dec 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast