Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Talbot Stonor

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1678²Born
Feb 1711³33.0Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
18 Sep 171537.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
18 Sep 171537.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
9 Aug 171638.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
29 Mar 175678.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Talbot Stonor (VIAF: 31872353)
Bishop John Talbot Stonor (born 1678, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Midland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStonor Park, Henley on Thames, Oxfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestParis, Diocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceStonor Park, Henley on Thames, Oxfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Buried Place (Original)Stonor Park, Henley on Thames, Oxfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 189
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 21
  • op: CB, 20 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast