Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Liverpool

Archidioecesis Liverpolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Malcolm Patrick McMahon, O.P., Archbishop
  • Thomas Anthony Williams, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Patrick Altham Kelly, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Vincent Malone, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 October 1911
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: England
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 1,165 (449 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprising: W. Lancashire south of the Ribble, parts of Merseyside, Cheshire, Greater Manchester and the Isle of Man.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.liverpoolcatholic.org.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Centre for Evangelisation, Croxteth Drive, Sefton Park, Liverpool L17 1AA, England, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (0151)522-1012
  • Fax: 522-1014

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District
1840ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern District Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District (erected)
29 September 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District Diocese of Salford (erected)
29 September 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central District
Vicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District
Vicariate Apostolic of Wales District
Diocese of Shrewsbury (erected)
Diocese of Liverpool
29 September 1850ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lancashire District Diocese of Liverpool
Archdiocese of Liverpool
28 October 1911ElevatedDiocese of Liverpool Archdiocese of Liverpool
22 November 1924Territory LostDiocese of Hexham and Newcastle
Archdiocese of Liverpool
Diocese of Lancaster (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Liverpool
1950423,3922,374,82417.8%5011886896142681,191178ap1951
1970534,0911,980,00027.0%4851796648042641,020229ap1971
1980530,0001,400,00037.9%46317964282552191,221226ap1981
1990507,6551,250,00040.6%3391484871,04255201939226ap1991
1999508,0001,100,00046.2%2841404241,19884196590223ap2000
2000495,0001,100,00045.0%2781043821,29586139616223ap2001
2001498,0001,100,00045.3%2821123941,26389147616227ap2002
2002508,0001,100,00046.2%2851013861,31691143357218ap2003
2003508,0001,100,00046.2%2681063741,35895148458206ap2004
2004506,3191,100,00046.0%2541063601,40697148458203ap2005
2012513,0001,135,00045.2%238903281,564106105438177ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 May 2014