Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Leighton Williams

Deceased

Archbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1877Born
24 Aug 190023.4Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 192952.2AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
25 Jul 192952.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
1 Apr 194669.0DiedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Leighton Williams
Archbishop Thomas Leighton Williams (born , died ) Archbishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHandsworth, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, 6 Norfolk Road, Edgbaston, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 62
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 217
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 485, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast